+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2020-34
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Received
- Referred to Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) adopted (555754)
- Ordered engrossed
- Placed on 3rd reading
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Rules
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/21/20, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
424964 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/10/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
590774 - Amendment (Delete All) (Senate: Withdrawn 3/3/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
555754 - Amendment (Delete All) (Senate: Adopted 3/4/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.071 - General exemptions from inspection or copying of public records.
+ − Votes (5)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 966 Filed
- Yeas: 7
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 966 Filed
- Yeas: 5
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 966 c1
- Yeas: 14
March 11, 2020: Floor vote: S 966 e1
- Yeas: 118
March 5, 2020: Floor vote: S 966 e1
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor