+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- In Messages
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/27/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/21/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On December 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy
On November 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 413.207 - Division of Vocational Rehabilitation; quality assurance.
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 962 Filed
- Yeas: 9
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 962 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 962 Filed
- Yeas: 10
February 11, 2016: Floor vote: S 962
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor