+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 785 (Ch. 2014-131)
- Substituted CS/HB 785
- Read 2nd time
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Remaining references corrected to Rules
- Now in Rules
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/07/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/11/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
689892 - Substitute Amendment (833038)
Delete lines 16 - 27 and insert:
833038 - Amendment
Delete lines 16 - 27 and insert:
161156 - Amendment
Delete lines 20 - 21 and insert:
754784 - Amendment
Before line 11 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0952 Filed
- Yeas: 11
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0952 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0952 c1
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor