+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Education read 1st time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendment
289614 - Amendment
Delete line 24 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1002.331 - High-performing charter schools.
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 934 Filed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 934 c1
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor