+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 437
- Amendment(s) adopted (559290)
- Read 2nd time
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 03/27/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/14/13, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (6)
559290 - Amendment
04/25/2013 at 7:27 AM
160372 - Amendment (698404)
04/17/2013 at 12:40 PM
698404 - Amendment
04/16/2013 at 7:43 PM
367800 - Amendment
Delete lines 128 - 369.
836864 - Amendment
Delete line 639 and insert:
631694 - Amendment
Between lines 42 and 43 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 159.603 - Definitions.
- 159.608 - Powers of housing finance authorities.
- 196.1978 - Affordable housing property exemption.
- 420.0003 - State housing strategy.
- 420.0006 - Authority to contract with corporation; contract requirements; nonperformance.
- 420.504 - Public corporation; creation, membership, terms, expenses.
- 420.506 - Executive director; agents and employees; inspector general.
- 420.507 - Powers of the corporation.
- 420.5087 - State Apartment Incentive Loan Program.
- 420.5091 -
- 420.511 - Strategic business plan; long
- 420.5091 - HOPE Program.
- 420.511 - Business plan; strategic plan; annual report.
- 212.08 - Sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, and storage tax; specified exemptions.
- 220.183 - Community contribution tax credit.
- 624.5105 - Community contribution tax credit; authorization; limitations; eligibility and application requirements; administration; definitions; expiration.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor