+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Banking and Insurance
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analysis
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor