+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table
- Substituted CS/HB 7003 (Died in House returning Messages)
- Read 2nd time
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/15
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 2
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/24/15, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/04/15, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Discussed/Workshop
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (16)
524462 - Amendment
Delete line 752 and insert:
304826 - Amendment
Delete lines 727 - 731 and insert:
871672 - Amendment
Between lines 3539 and 3540 insert:
515714 - Amendment
Between lines 4211 and 4212 insert:
575832 - Amendment
Between lines 3539 and 3540 insert:
901608 - Amendment to Amendment (322890)
Between lines 446 and 447 insert:
152138 - Amendment to Amendment (322890)
Between lines 2438 and 2439 insert:
129140 - Amendment to Amendment (322890)
Delete lines 2537 - 2643 and insert:
229130 - Amendment to Amendment (322890)
Delete line 2583 and insert:
869652 - Amendment to Amendment (322890)
Between lines 3404 and 3405 insert:
322890 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
574168 - Amendment to Amendment (612098)
Between lines 879 and 880 insert:
612098 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
669098 - Amendment to Amendment (612098)
Delete lines 3012 - 3026 and insert:
877366 - Amendment to Amendment (612098)
Between lines 830 and 831 insert:
647994 - Amendment to Amendment (612098)
Delete lines 3244 - 3263 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (42)
- 259.032 - Conservation and Recreation Lands Trust Fund; purpose.
- 260.0144 - Sponsorship of state greenways and trails.
- 335.065 - Bicycle and pedestrian ways along state roads and transportation facilities.
- 339.81 -
- 339.82 -
- 339.83 -
- 373.036 - Florida water plan; district water management plans.
- 373.042 - Minimum flows and levels.
- 373.0421 - Establishment and implementation of minimum flows and levels.
- 373.801 -
- 373.802 -
- 373.803 -
- 373.805 -
- 373.807 -
- 373.809 -
- 373.811 -
- 373.813 -
- 373.815 -
- 403.061 - Department; powers and duties.
- 403.0616 -
- 403.0623 - Environmental data; quality assurance.
- 373.019 - Definitions.
- 373.0465 -
- 373.1501 - South Florida Water Management District as local sponsor.
- 373.223 - Conditions for a permit.
- 373.2234 - Preferred water supply sources.
- 373.227 - Water conservation; legislative findings and intent; objectives; comprehensive statewide water conservation program requirements.
- 373.233 - Competing applications.
- 373.4591 - Improvements on private agricultural lands.
- 373.4595 - Northern Everglades and Estuaries Protection Program.
- 373.536 - District budget and hearing thereon.
- 373.703 - Water production; general powers and duties.
- 373.705 - Water resource development; water supply development.
- 373.707 - Alternative water supply development.
- 373.709 - Regional water supply planning.
- 403.0617 -
- 403.861 - Department; powers and duties.
- 373.037 -
- 373.219 - Permits required.
- 373.467 - The Harris Chain of Lakes Restoration Council.
- 403.067 - Establishment and implementation of total maximum daily loads.
- 403.0675 -
+ − Votes (3)
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 0918 Filed
- Yeas: 8
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 0918 c1
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 0918 c1
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 2