+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 165 (Ch. 2015-135)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
634480 - Amendment
Delete lines 23 - 71 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0916 Filed
- Yeas: 9
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0916 c1
- Yeas: 4
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0916 c1
- Yeas: 12
April 24, 2015: Floor vote: S 0916 c1
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor