+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
- Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On November 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 16, 2022: Floor vote: S 912 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor