+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Education
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- Now in Education
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/09/13, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Education; Community Affairs; Rules
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
363828 - Amendment
Between lines 141 and 142 insert:
308534 - Amendment
Delete line 134 and insert:
950250 - Amendment
Delete line 63 and insert:
+ − Sponsors (2)
Health Policy
Type:
Primary Sponsor