+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Finance and Tax
- Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs and Space, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Article VII - Section 6
- Article XII -
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 886 Filed
- Yeas: 7
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 886 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor