+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 573 (Ch. 2020-104)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Amendment(s) adopted (613272)
- Read 3rd time
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/18/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
460020 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/19/2020)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
613272 - Amendment (Senate: Adopted 3/9/2020)
Delete lines 121 - 126.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 884 Filed
- Yeas: 5
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 884 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 884 Filed
- Yeas: 19
March 9, 2020: Floor vote: S 884 c1
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor