+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died pending review, Rule 4.7(2), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2017-149)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 05/01/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/28/17, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Regulated Industries
- Remaining references corrected to Regulated Industries; Appropriations; Rules
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/14/17, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (4)
889626 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
175948 - Amendment
Between lines 316 and 317 insert:
200984 - Amendment to Amendment (153030)
Between lines 261 and 262 insert:
153030 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 468.603 - Definitions.
- 468.609 - Administration of this part; standards for certification; additional categories of certification.
- 471.045 - Professional engineers performing building code inspector duties.
- 481.222 - Architects performing building code inspection services.
- 553.791 - Alternative plans review and inspection.
- 468.617 - Joint building code inspection department; other arrangements.
- 468.8313 - Examinations.
- 553.73 - Florida Building Code.
- 553.76 - General powers of the commission.
- 489.113 - Qualifications for practice; restrictions.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 860 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 860 c1
- Yeas: 10
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 860 c2
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor