+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2014-64
- Approved by Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 0
- Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (414241, 429117, 487991)
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/CS/HB 31
- Amendment(s) adopted (414241, 429117, 487991)
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In returning messages
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14
- Referred to Calendar
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/14
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Introduced
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
- Now in Rules
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/14, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On December 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/10/13, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On September 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 10/08/13, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations; Rules
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
429117 - Amendment
Remove lines 52-67 and insert:
414241 - Amendment
Remove lines 71-89 and insert:
487991 - Amendment
Remove lines 93-110 and insert:
440522 - Amendment
Delete lines 65 - 118 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (7)
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0086 c1
- Yeas: 12
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0086 Filed
- Yeas: 12
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0086 Filed
- Yeas: 18
November 6, 2014: Floor vote: S 0086 Filed
- Yeas: 8
May 1, 2014: Floor vote: S 0086 c1
- Yeas: 27
April 28, 2014: Floor vote: S 0086 c1
- Yeas: 115
March 18, 2014: Floor vote: S 0086 c1
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor