+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
- Now in Appropriations
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation read 1st time
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On November 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
137428 - Amendment
Delete line 170 and insert:
295414 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 852 Filed
- Yeas: 7
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 852 c1
- Yeas: 8
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 852 c1
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1