+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Commerce and Tourism
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
320944 - Amendment
Delete lines 44 - 45 and insert:
799368 - Amendment
Delete lines 76 - 78.
+ − Vote
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0848 Filed
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor