+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-3
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 7033
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Bill referred to House Calendar
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 846 Filed
- Yeas: 14
February 10, 2022: Floor vote: S 846 Filed
- Yeas: 118
January 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 846 Filed
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor