+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died in Commerce and Tourism
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/03/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 443.131 - Contributions.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor