+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 565 (Ch. 2018-132)
- Substituted CS/HB 565
- Read 2nd time
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Education read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- CS by Education; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations
On November 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
495428 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 1009.286 - Additional student payment for hours exceeding baccalaureate degree program completion requirements at state universities.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 844 Filed
- Yeas: 11
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 844 c1
- Yeas: 5
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 844 c1
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor