+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 107 (Ch. 2017-40)
- Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 107
- Read 2nd time
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/17
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (4)
869370 - Amendment
Delete line 75 and insert:
156066 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (129514)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
717080 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (129514)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
129514 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 872.02 - Injuring or removing tomb or monument; disturbing contents of grave or tomb; penalties.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 844 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 844 c1
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 844 c1
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor