+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 1011.79 -
+ − Vote
April 5, 2018: Floor vote: S 824 Filed
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor