+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.071 - General exemptions from inspection or copying of public records.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor