+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table
- Substituted CS/HB 491 (Died in returning Messages)
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendment
362040 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/4/2020)
Delete lines 27 - 34 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 106.141 - Disposition of surplus funds by candidates.
+ − Votes (3)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 814 Filed
- Yeas: 7
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 814 c1
- Yeas: 4
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 814 c1
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor