+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2016-168
- Approved by Governor
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for HB 699
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16
- Referred to Calendar
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- In Messages
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/28/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Introduced
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Commerce and Tourism
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On November 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/01/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 629.271 - Distribution of savings.
+ − Votes (5)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 812 Filed
- Yeas: 11
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 812 Filed
- Yeas: 7
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 812 Filed
- Yeas: 13
March 8, 2016: Floor vote: S 812
- Yeas: 117
February 2, 2016: Floor vote: S 812
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor