+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Transportation
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 320.06 - Registration certificates, license plates, and validation stickers generally.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor