+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 775 (Ch. 2014-129), CS/CS/HB 773 (Ch. 2014-128)
- Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 775
- Read 2nd time
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/14
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Now in Rules
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/14, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/13/14, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
586338 - Amendment
Delete lines 17 - 36 and insert:
101600 - Amendment
Delete line 25 and insert:
541346 - Amendment
Delete lines 38 - 59 and insert:
569154 - Amendment
Delete line 64 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 548.062 -
+ − Votes (3)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0808 Filed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0808 c1
- Yeas: 9
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0808 c2
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor