+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
- Remaining references corrected to Criminal Justice
- Now in Criminal Justice
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/15/13, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/09/13, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
428062 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 381.0038 - Education.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Health Policy
Type:
Primary Sponsor