+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1239 (Ch. 2022-61)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 1239
- Read 2nd time
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Retained on Special Order Calendar
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy read 1st time
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Remaining references corrected to Rules
- Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Policy; Community Affairs; Rules
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (6)
667406 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/10/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
627240 - Amendment (Out of Order 3/1/2022)
Delete lines 119 - 313 and insert:
308330 - Amendment (Delete All) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/1/2022)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
615290 - Amendment to Amendment (308330) (Withdrawn 3/1/2022)
Delete lines 70 - 230 and insert:
612826 - Amendment to Amendment (308330) (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/1/2022)
Delete line 137 and insert:
114810 - Amendment (Senate: Not Considered 3/4/2022)
Between lines 296 and 297 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 400.021 - Definitions.
- 400.0234 - Availability of facility records for investigation of resident’s rights violations and defenses; penalty.
- 400.024 - Failure to satisfy a judgment or settlement agreement.
- 400.141 - Administration and management of nursing home facilities.
- 400.23 - Rules; evaluation and deficiencies; licensure status.
+ − Votes (2)
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 804 Filed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
July 20, 2022: Floor vote: S 804 c1
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor