+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Judiciary
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 768.13 - Good Samaritan Act; immunity from civil liability.
+ − Vote
June 16, 2019: Floor vote: S 800 Filed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor