+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
- Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15
- Referred to Calendar
- In Messages
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Ordered engrossed
- Amendment(s) adopted (402382)
- Read 2nd time
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
402382 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
419526 - Substitute Amendment (949376)
Delete lines 82 - 567 and insert:
949376 - Amendment
Delete lines 82 - 456 and insert:
518216 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 507.01 - Definitions.
- 507.02 - Construction; intent; application.
- 507.03 - Registration.
- 507.04 - Required insurance coverages; liability limitations; valuation coverage.
- 507.045 -
- 507.05 - Estimates and contracts for service.
- 507.054 -
- 507.055 -
- 507.06 - Delivery and storage of household goods.
- 507.065 -
- 507.066 -
- 507.07 - Violations.
- 507.09 - Administrative remedies; penalties.
- 507.11 - Criminal penalties.
- 507.14 -
- 507.10 - Civil penalties; remedies.
+ − Votes (4)
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0798 Filed
- Yeas: 5
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0798 c1
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0798 c1
- Yeas: 15
April 27, 2015: Floor vote: S 0798 e1
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor