+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/07/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/31/15, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Rules
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0796 Filed
- Yeas: 10
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0796 Filed
- Yeas: 10
May 29, 2015: Floor vote: S 0796 Filed
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor