+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- Now in Appropriations
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
- Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
On November 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (2)
753432 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
217188 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (753432)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 780 Filed
- Yeas: 11
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 780 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor