+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Messages
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Ordered engrossed
- Amendment(s) adopted (916808)
- Read 2nd time
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 03/27/13, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/13, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
916808 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 8:11 PM
888200 - Amendment
04/24/2013 at 6:32 PM
679098 - Amendment (Delete All)
04/03/2013 at 10:19 AM
182796 - Amendment (Delete All)
03/05/2013 at 5:17 PM
+ − Statute Amended
- 163.506 - Local government neighborhood improvement districts; creation; advisory council; dissolution.
+ − Vote
April 30, 2013: Senate floor vote on S 0770 e1
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor