+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 343 (Ch. 2017-81)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 343
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/18/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
977030 - Amendment
Delete line 54 and insert:
432620 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 766 Filed
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 766 c1
- Yeas: 4
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 766 c1
- Yeas: 17