+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Rules
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/31/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Amendment
842356 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/23/2021)
Delete lines 34 - 77 and insert:
+ − Statute Amended
- 320.025 - Registration certificate and license plate or decal issued under fictitious name; application.
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2021: Floor vote: S 762 Filed
- Yeas: 8
May 15, 2021: Floor vote: S 762 c1
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor