+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Messages
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 742 Filed
- Yeas: 9
June 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 742 Filed
- Yeas: 5
June 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 742 Filed
- Yeas: 16
April 26, 2019: Floor vote: S 742 Filed
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor