+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2020-177)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 747
- Read 2nd time
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
- Now in Rules
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Health Policy
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules
On November 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (3)
198296 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 1/21/2020)
Delete lines 23 - 48 and insert:
468164 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/11/2020)
Delete lines 25 - 61 and insert:
313996 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 3/3/2020)
Delete lines 40 - 83 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (3)
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 736 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 736 c1
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
November 17, 2020: Floor vote: S 736 c2
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor