+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2017-121
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for CS/HB 267
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
- Referred to Calendar
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediately certified
- CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on 3rd reading
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/12/17, 5:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Now in Banking and Insurance
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (2)
842814 - Amendment
Delete lines 232 - 234 and insert:
877786 - Amendment
Delete lines 265 - 286.
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- 732.2025 - Definitions.
- 732.2035 - Property entering into elective estate.
- 732.2045 - Exclusions and overlapping application.
- 732.2055 - Valuation of the elective estate.
- 732.2065 - Amount of the elective share.
- 732.2075 - Sources from which elective share payable; abatement.
- 732.2085 - Liability of direct recipients and beneficiaries.
- 732.2095 - Valuation of property used to satisfy elective share.
- 732.2115 - Protection of payors and other third parties.
- 732.2135 - Time of election; extensions; withdrawal.
- 732.2145 - Order of contribution; personal representative’s duty to collect contribution.
- 732.2151 -
- 738.606 - Property not productive of income.
+ − Votes (5)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 724 Filed
- Yeas: 9
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 724 c1
- Yeas: 9
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 724 c2
- Yeas: 12
April 28, 2017: Floor vote: S 724 c2
- Yeas: 117
April 19, 2017: Floor vote: S 724 c2
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor