+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 449 (Ch. 2018-148)
- Substituted HB 449
- Read 2nd time
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Now in Community Affairs
- Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On January 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
On November 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs; Rules
On November 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 409.147 - Children’s initiatives.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 720 Filed
- Yeas: 5
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 720 Filed
- Yeas: 5
May 3, 2018: Floor vote: S 720 Filed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor