+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Agriculture
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules
On November 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 823.15 - Public or private animal agencies; sterilization required for dogs and cats released; recordkeeping requirements; microchipping.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor