+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Finance and Tax
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Now in Finance and Tax
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Rules
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Amendment
166472 - Amendment
Delete lines 53 - 91 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
June 17, 2019: Floor vote: S 710 Filed
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor