+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7101 (Ch. 2016-13)
- Substituted HB 7101
- Amendment(s) reconsidered, failed (804220)
- Amendment(s) failed (804220)
- Read 2nd time
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/16
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Criminal Justice
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
804220 - Amendment
Delete lines 155 - 389 and insert:
109706 - Amendment
Delete lines 154 - 157 and insert:
163840 - Amendment
Delete lines 1033 - 1036.
936370 - Amendment
Delete lines 149 - 186 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 775.082 - Penalties; applicability of sentencing structures; mandatory minimum sentences for certain reoffenders previously released from prison.
- 782.04 - Murder.
- 794.011 - Sexual battery.
- 893.135 - Trafficking; mandatory sentences; suspension or reduction of sentences; conspiracy to engage in trafficking.
- 921.141 - Sentence of death or life imprisonment for capital felonies; further proceedings to determine sentence.
- 921.142 - Sentence of death or life imprisonment for capital drug trafficking felonies; further proceedings to determine sentence.
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7068 pb
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7068 Filed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 6
March 2, 2016: Floor vote: S 7068 c1 - Amendment 804220
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 22
March 2, 2016: Floor vote: S 7068 c1 - Amendment 804220
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 23
+ − Sponsor
Criminal Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor