+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/25/20, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
- Submitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (5)
182020 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/25/2020)
Delete lines 102 - 109 and insert:
274560 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/25/2020)
Between lines 332 and 333 insert:
822698 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/25/2020)
Between lines 398 and 399 insert:
167288 - Amendment (Withdrawn 2/25/2020)
Between lines 463 and 464 insert:
566528 - Amendment (Replaced by Committee Substitute 2/25/2020)
Between lines 1179 and 1180 insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (28)
- 20.23 - Department of Transportation.
- 201.15 - Distribution of taxes collected.
- 206.46 - State Transportation Trust Fund.
- 206.606 - Distribution of certain proceeds.
- 206.608 - State Comprehensive Enhanced Transportation System Tax; deposit of proceeds; distribution.
- 212.0501 - Tax on diesel fuel for business purposes; purchase, storage, and use.
- 288.0656 - Rural Economic Development Initiative.
- 311.101 - Intermodal Logistics Center Infrastructure Support Program.
- 319.32 - Fees; service charges; disposition.
- 333.03 - Requirement to adopt airport zoning regulations.
- 334.275 -
- 337.25 - Acquisition, lease, and disposal of real and personal property.
- 339.08 - Use of moneys in State Transportation Trust Fund.
- 339.135 - Work program; legislative budget request; definitions; preparation, adoption, execution, and amendment.
- 339.175 - Metropolitan planning organization.
- 339.2821 - Economic development transportation projects.
- 341.302 - Rail program; duties and responsibilities of the department.
- 341.303 - Funding authorization and appropriations; eligibility and participation.
- 341.8201 - Short title.
- 341.8203 - Definitions.
- 341.822 - Powers and duties.
- 341.825 - Communication facilities.
- 341.836 - Associated development.
- 341.838 - Fares, rates, rents, fees, and charges.
- 341.839 - Alternate means.
- 341.840 - Tax exemption.
- 343.58 - County funding for the South Florida Regional Transportation Authority.
- 377.809 - Energy Economic Zone Pilot Program.
+ − Votes (2)
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 7054 pb
- Yeas: 8
November 18, 2020: Floor vote: S 7054 Filed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Infrastructure and Security
Type:
Primary Sponsor