+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Died in Messages
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- In Messages
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 2
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Now in Rules
- Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/31/21, 8:00 am, 37 Senate Building
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Agriculture; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/03/21, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
- Submitted for consideration by Agriculture
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Statute Amended
- 601.76 - Manufacturer to furnish formula and other information.
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2021: Floor vote: S 7048 pb
- Yeas: 9
June 1, 2021: Floor vote: S 7048 Filed
- Yeas: 5
June 1, 2021: Floor vote: S 7048 Filed
- Yeas: 16
April 22, 2021: Floor vote: S 7048 Filed
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor