+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2016-216
- Approved by Governor
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Substituted for CS/HB 7065
- Read 2nd time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Received
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16
- Referred to Calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- In Messages
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Ordered engrossed
- Amendment(s) adopted (572960, 715372)
- Placed on 3rd reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/18/16
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Fiscal Policy
- Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/28/16, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
On January 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
- Submitted for consideration by Commerce and Tourism
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Amendments (5)
617751 - Amendment
Between lines 484 and 485, insert:
112857 - Amendment
Between lines 484 and 485, insert:
572960 - Amendment
Delete lines 103 - 412 and insert:
715372 - Amendment
Delete lines 1512 - 1516 and insert:
241658 - Amendment
Delete lines 1252 - 2293 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (54)
- 20.60 - Department of Economic Opportunity; creation; powers and duties.
- 212.08 - Sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, and storage tax; specified exemptions.
- 220.183 - Community contribution tax credit.
- 250.10 - Appointment and duties of the Adjutant General.
- 288.047 - Quick-response training for economic development.
- 290.0056 - Enterprise zone development agency.
- 322.34 - Driving while license suspended, revoked, canceled, or disqualified.
- 341.052 - Public transit block grant program; administration; eligible projects; limitation.
- 414.045 - Cash assistance program.
- 414.065 - Noncompliance with work requirements.
- 414.085 - Income eligibility standards.
- 414.095 - Determining eligibility for temporary cash assistance.
- 414.105 - Time limitations of temporary cash assistance.
- 414.106 - Exemption from public meetings law.
- 414.295 - Temporary cash assistance programs; public records exemption.
- 420.623 - Local coalitions for the homeless.
- 420.624 - Local homeless assistance continuum of care.
- 427.013 - The Commission for the Transportation Disadvantaged; purpose and responsibilities.
- 427.0155 - Community transportation coordinators; powers and duties.
- 427.0157 - Coordinating boards; powers and duties.
- 443.091 - Benefit eligibility conditions.
- 443.1116 - Short-time compensation.
- 445.003 - Implementation of the federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998.
- 445.004 - CareerSource Florida, Inc.; creation; purpose; membership; duties and powers.
- 445.006 - Strategic and operational plans for workforce development.
- 445.007 - Regional workforce boards.
- 445.0071 - Florida Youth Summer Jobs Pilot Program.
- 445.009 - One-stop delivery system.
- 445.014 - Small business workforce service initiative.
- 445.017 - Diversion.
- 445.021 - Relocation assistance program.
- 445.022 - Retention Incentive Training Accounts.
- 445.024 - Work requirements.
- 445.025 - Other support services.
- 445.026 - Cash assistance severance benefit.
- 445.030 - Transitional education and training.
- 445.031 - Transitional transportation.
- 445.048 - Passport to Economic Progress program.
- 445.051 - Individual development accounts.
- 985.622 - Multiagency plan for career and professional education (CAPE).
- 1002.83 - Early learning coalitions.
- 1003.491 - Florida Career and Professional Education Act.
- 1003.492 - Industry-certified career education programs.
- 1003.493 - Career and professional academies and career-themed courses.
- 1003.4935 - Middle grades career and professional academy courses and career-themed courses.
- 1003.52 - Educational services in Department of Juvenile Justice programs.
- 1004.93 - Adult general education.
- 1006.261 - Use of school buses for public purposes.
- 1009.25 - Fee exemptions.
- 445.016 - Untried Worker Placement and Employment Incentive Act.
- 445.07 - Economic security report of employment and earning outcomes.
- 115.01 - Leave of absence for military service.
- 250.482 - Troops ordered into state active service; not to be penalized by employers and postsecondary institutions.
- 250.81 - Legislative intent.
+ − Votes (5)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7040 pb
- Yeas: 6
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7040 Filed
- Yeas: 8
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7040 Filed
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2016: Floor vote: S 7040 e1
- Yeas: 115
February 23, 2016: Floor vote: S 7040 e1
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsor
Commerce and Tourism
Type:
Primary Sponsor