+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7022 (Ch. 2017-88)
- Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 05/01/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Appropriations
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/24/17, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
- Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
686242 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
584972 - Amendment to Amendment (686242)
Between lines 2169 and 2170 insert:
276328 - Amendment
Delete lines 480 - 1079 and insert:
435512 - Amendment
Delete lines 1298 - 1316 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 112.1816 -
- 121.053 - Participation in the Elected Officers’ Class for retired members.
- 121.055 - Senior Management Service Class.
- 121.091 - Benefits payable under the system.
- 121.122 - Renewed membership in system.
- 121.4501 - Florida Retirement System Investment Plan.
- 121.591 - Payment of benefits.
- 121.5912 - Survivor benefit retirement program; qualified status; rulemaking authority.
- 121.735 - Allocations for member line-of-duty death benefits; percentage amounts.
- 110.123 - State group insurance program.
- 110.12303 -
- 110.12304 -
+ − Votes (2)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7030 pb
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 7030 Filed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor