+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter No. 2022-172
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Added to Third Reading Calendar
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 7031
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
- Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
- Bill referred to House Calendar
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Immediately certified
- Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- In Messages
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/03/22
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Rules
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
- Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- 119.071 - General exemptions from inspection or copying of public records.
+ − Votes (4)
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 7024 pb
- Yeas: 6
July 19, 2022: Floor vote: S 7024 Filed
- Yeas: 16
March 4, 2022: Floor vote: S 7024 Filed
- Yeas: 112
February 3, 2022: Floor vote: S 7024 Filed
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsor
Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Type:
Primary Sponsor