+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7055 (Ch. 2014-162)
- Substituted CS/CS/HB 7055
- Read 3rd time
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/19/14, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary read 1st time
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/12/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- CS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
- Introduced
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/14, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Now in Judiciary
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/17/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
692010 - Amendment
Between lines 2630 and 2631 insert:
452128 - Amendment to Amendment (478698)
Delete line 2760 and insert:
478698 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
956860 - Amendment
Delete lines 656 - 2326 and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (51)
- 121.0515 - Special Risk Class.
- 943.0582 - Prearrest, postarrest, or teen court diversion program expunction.
- 945.75 - Tours of state correctional facilities for juveniles.
- 985.01 - Purposes and intent.
- 985.02 - Legislative intent for the juvenile justice system.
- 985.03 - Definitions.
- 985.0301 - Jurisdiction.
- 985.037 - Punishment for contempt of court; alternative sanctions.
- 985.045 - Court records.
- 985.105 - Youth custody officer.
- 985.11 - Fingerprinting and photographing.
- 985.14 - Intake and case management system.
- 985.145 - Responsibilities of juvenile probation officer during intake; screenings and assessments.
- 985.17 -
- 985.24 - Use of detention; prohibitions.
- 985.245 - Risk assessment instrument.
- 985.25 - Detention intake.
- 985.255 - Detention criteria; detention hearing.
- 985.26 - Length of detention.
- 985.265 - Detention transfer and release; education; adult jails.
- 985.27 - Postcommitment detention while awaiting placement.
- 985.275 - Detention of escapee or absconder on authority of the department.
- 985.433 - Disposition hearings in delinquency cases.
- 985.435 - Probation and postcommitment probation; community service.
- 985.439 - Violation of probation or postcommitment probation.
- 985.441 - Commitment.
- 985.46 - Conditional release.
- 985.461 - Transition to adulthood.
- 985.481 - Sexual offenders adjudicated delinquent; notification upon release.
- 985.4815 - Notification to Department of Law Enforcement of information on juvenile sexual offenders.
- 985.601 - Administering the juvenile justice continuum.
- 985.605 - Prevention service program; monitoring; uniform performance measures.
- 985.606 - Prevention services providers; performance data collection; reporting.
- 985.61 - Early delinquency intervention program; criteria.
- 985.632 - Quality assurance and cost-effectiveness.
- 985.644 - Departmental contracting powers; personnel standards and screening.
- 985.6441 -
- 985.66 - Juvenile justice training academies; staff development and training; Juvenile Justice Training Trust Fund.
- 985.664 - Juvenile justice circuit advisory boards.
- 985.672 - Direct-support organization; definition; use of property; board of directors; audit.
- 985.682 - Siting of facilities; study; criteria.
- 985.69 - One-time startup funding for juvenile justice purposes.
- 985.694 - Juvenile Care and Maintenance Trust Fund.
- 985.701 - Sexual misconduct prohibited; reporting required; penalties.
- 985.702 -
- 985.721 - Escapes from secure detention or residential commitment facility.
- 316.635 - Courts having jurisdiction over traffic violations; powers relating to custody and detention of minors.
- 318.143 - Sanctions for infractions by minors.
- 985.039 - Cost of supervision; cost of care.
- 985.101 - Taking a child into custody.
- 985.514 - Responsibility for cost of care; fees.
+ − Votes (4)
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0700 Filed
- Yeas: 6
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0700 Filed
- Yeas: 8
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0700 c1
- Yeas: 12
November 5, 2014: Floor vote: S 0700 c1
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor