+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Chapter No. 2015-1
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
- Read 3rd time
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Substituted for HB 7027
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/15
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received
- Referred to Calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Introduced
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- In Messages
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
- Immediately certified
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/15
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
- Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 23, 2015: Floor vote: S 0700 Filed
- Yeas: 10
March 11, 2015: Floor vote: S 0700
- Yeas: 116
March 3, 2015: Floor vote: S 0700
- Yeas: 38
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor