+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 479 (Ch. 2016-22), CS/CS/CS/HB 651 (Ch. 2016-132), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), HB 7071 (Ch. 2016-151)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/16, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Appropriations
- Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
- On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/16, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
- Now in Community Affairs
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/09/16, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
- Introduced
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/12/16, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
On November 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations
On October 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Amendments (6)
399826 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
214662 - Amendment to Substitute Amendment (637650)
Delete lines 664 - 1444 and insert:
637650 - Substitute Amendment (Delete All) (933068)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
933068 - Amendment
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
632244 - Amendment to Amendment (758354)
Delete line 1157 and insert:
758354 - Amendment (Delete All)
Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert:
+ − Statutes Amended (49)
- 11.40 - Legislative Auditing Committee.
- 11.45 - Definitions; duties; authorities; reports; rules.
- 20.602 -
- 28.35 - Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation.
- 43.16 - Justice Administrative Commission; membership, powers and duties.
- 68.082 - False claims against the state; definitions; liability.
- 68.083 - Civil actions for false claims.
- 99.061 - Method of qualifying for nomination or election to federal, state, county, or district office.
- 112.313 - Standards of conduct for public officers, employees of agencies, and local government attorneys.
- 112.3144 - Full and public disclosure of financial interests.
- 112.31455 - Collection methods for unpaid automatic fines for failure to timely file disclosure of financial interests.
- 112.3261 - Lobbying before water management districts; registration and reporting.
- 129.03 - Preparation and adoption of budget.
- 129.06 - Execution and amendment of budget.
- 166.241 - Fiscal years, budgets, and budget amendments.
- 189.016 - Reports; budgets; audits.
- 215.425 - Extra compensation claims prohibited; bonuses; severance pay.
- 215.86 - Management systems and controls.
- 215.97 - Florida Single Audit Act.
- 215.985 - Transparency in government spending.
- 218.32 - Annual financial reports; local governmental entities.
- 218.33 - Local governmental entities; establishment of uniform fiscal years and accounting practices and procedures.
- 218.39 - Annual financial audit reports.
- 218.391 - Auditor selection procedures.
- 218.503 - Determination of financial emergency.
- 286.0114 - Public meetings; reasonable opportunity to be heard; attorney fees.
- 288.92 - Divisions of Enterprise Florida, Inc.
- 288.9604 - Creation of the authority.
- 373.536 - District budget and hearing thereon.
- 817.568 - Criminal use of personal identification information.
- 838.014 - Definitions.
- 838.015 - Bribery.
- 838.016 - Unlawful compensation or reward for official behavior.
- 838.022 - Official misconduct.
- 838.22 - Bid tampering.
- 1001.42 - Powers and duties of district school board.
- 1002.33 - Charter schools.
- 1002.37 - The Florida Virtual School.
- 1002.455 - Student eligibility for K-12 virtual instruction.
- 1010.01 - Uniform records and accounts.
- 1010.30 - Audits required.
- 11.045 - Lobbying before the Legislature; registration and reporting; exemptions; penalties.
- 11.0455 - Electronic filing of compensation reports and other information.
- 112.3126 -
- 112.3215 - Lobbying before the executive branch or the Constitution Revision Commission; registration and reporting; investigation by commission.
- 112.324 - Procedures on complaints of violations and referrals; public records and meeting exemptions.
- 921.0022 - Criminal Punishment Code; offense severity ranking chart.
- 112.534 - Failure to comply; official misconduct.
- 117.01 - Appointment, application, suspension, revocation, application fee, bond, and oath.
+ − Votes (3)
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 686 Filed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 686 c1
- Yeas: 5
October 10, 2017: Floor vote: S 686 c2
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor